+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read second, amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On October 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/05/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 8, 2015 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor