+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 42 of the Acts of 2019
On July 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Governor
- Enacted -see Roll Call #83 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0)
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 82)
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor