+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On July 29, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2014
On July 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 22, 2014 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Rules suspended
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On September 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor