+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 215 of the Acts of 2016
On July 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On July 30, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On July 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Transportation
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
Floor Amendment