+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On September 19, 2013 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On August 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On August 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules