+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H3717
On July 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 07/28/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437
- Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor