+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/19/2022 from 03:00 PM-06:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor