+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4528
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Health Care Financing
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1
On November 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD
- Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security