+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 25, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4487
On July 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 24, 2014, pending concurrence
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday June 27, 2014, pending concurrence
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor