+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On November 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2013
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Governor
- Enacted - Roll Call #228 [YEAS 39 - NAYS 0]
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted - 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 273)
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On November 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in the House further amendment
- Rules suspended
On November 20, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment with a further amendment
- Rules suspended
On November 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On November 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On October 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read and placed in the Order of the Day for the next session
On October 10, 2013 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On September 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On September 19, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 12, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
On July 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On July 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Vote
November 20, 2013: Senate Roll Call # 228
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor