+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 155 of the Acts of 2015
On December 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On November 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On July 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor