+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Accompanied by S88
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Community Development and Small Businesses
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor