+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 19, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4785
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 9, 2018, pending concurrence
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/05/17 from 10:30AM-1:00PM in A-2
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Financial Services
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary