+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On November 7, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2013
On October 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On October 28, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted
On October 24, 2013 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On October 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On October 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On October 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On August 26, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On August 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor