+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 29, 2022 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H5446
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H5446
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 12/13/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor