+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2021
On November 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On November 15, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On November 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On July 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On July 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
- Accompanied by S2374
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor