+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 25, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4486
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday July 08, 2014, pending concurrence
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 03, 2014, pending concurrence
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/04/2014 from 01:00 AM-03:00 AM in 222
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 02/04/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor