+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules