+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 11, 2018 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H4737
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means)
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4737
- Order adopted, see H4733
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On October 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy