+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4630
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday, June 17, 2016, pending concurrence
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday, June 3, 2016, pending concurrence
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday, April 15, 2016, pending concurrence
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor