+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On August 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 66 of the Acts of 2013
On August 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On August 5, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted
On August 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On July 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read third and passed to be engrossed
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 11, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2013 from 03:30 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor