+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On December 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 352 of the Acts of 2016
On December 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On December 22, 2016 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought to pass
On November 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On November 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed
On July 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in 222
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor