+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor