+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On November 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 125 of the Acts of 2013
On October 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Governor
- Enacted -see Roll Call #200 [YEAS 36 - NAYS 0]
On October 30, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 237)
On October 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Taken out of the Orders of the Day
On September 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On July 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government
+ − Vote
October 30, 2013: Senate Roll Call # 200
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor