+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On September 25, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4490
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 3, 2014, pending concurrence
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday May 15, 2014, pending concurrence
On September 13, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2013 from 10:00 AM-08:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security