+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2015
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Enacted
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Emergency preamble adopted
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in the Senate amendment
- Referred to the committee on Bills in the Third Reading
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment
- Rules suspended
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the committee on Public Service
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Rules
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act establishing a sick leave bank
for Steven Goler, an employee of the Department of
Transportation
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor