+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 20, 2022 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On November 8, 2021 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight