+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On September 8, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H5256
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On June 29, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Friday April 15, 2022, pending concurrence
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight