+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On August 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/30/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:30 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor