+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On August 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On July 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On July 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on The Judiciary