+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On December 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation