+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enacted and laid before the Governor
On January 4, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted
On December 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate recedes from its amendment
- Rules suspended
On September 17, 2020 in the House:
- House NON-concurred in the Senate amendment
On July 24, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed
On November 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On November 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On October 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor