+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 22, 2022 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4934
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- House concurred
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 6, 2022, pending concurrence
- Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday April 6, 2022) adopted, pending concurrence
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 30, 2022, pending concurrence
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue