+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 3, 2017 in the House:
- No further action taken
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight