+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 15, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4462
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Recommitted to the committee on Financial Services
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on Financial Services
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/22/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor