+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On October 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
On September 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 10:00AM-12:00PM in A-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Transportation
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor