+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
On July 25, 2019 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight