+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 18, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Discharged to the committee on House Rules
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2013 from 10:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor