+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- New draft substituted, see H4022
- Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending
- Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending
- Committee recommends ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4022
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1
An Act relative to streamlining home
improvement contractor registration
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor