+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3654
- Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted
- Read third
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 04/07/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue