+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor