+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4811
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 9, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 16, 2020, pending concurrence
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 7, 2020, pending concurrence
On September 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Revenue
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor