+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security