+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On October 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2017 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor