+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On October 12, 2017 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor