+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 1, 2019 in the House:
- No further action taken
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Health
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor