+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read second and ordered to a third reading
- Rules suspended
- Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor