+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 9, 2014 in the House:
- Accompanied a new draft, see H4264
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled for 01/07/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service