+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
On September 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 09/29/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Public Service
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor