+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 18, 2018 in the House:
- Accompanied a study order, see H4624
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 20, 2018, pending concurrence
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor